OK SB656 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency and Transportation Revolving Fund; authorizing interest free loans to counties for compressed natural gas fleet vehicles. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Emergency and Transportation Revolving Fund; authorizing interest free loans to counties for compressed natural gas fleet vehicles. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] |
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Bobby Cleveland [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Emergency added |
2015-04-09 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland, Echols, Osborn |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Allen, Simpson |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |