OK SB641 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Master conservancy districts; formation and alteration of districts for drought purposes. Emergency.
Title
Master conservancy districts; formation and alteration of districts for drought purposes. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | Died in conference |
2013-05-08 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Schulz, Branan, Justice, Barrington, Bass, Burrage |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-08 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-04 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2013-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-04 | House | Amended |
2013-04-04 | House | House Rule suspended |
2013-04-04 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-21 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Energy |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |