OK SB55 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Approved by Governor 04/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; aggravated assaults on law enforcement; broadening inclusions. Effective date
Title
Crime and punishment; aggravated assaults on law enforcement; broadening inclusions. Effective date
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/07/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-31 | House | General Order |
2015-03-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Billy (principal House author) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |