OK SB53 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - coauthored by Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Article V of U.S. Constitution; specifying procedure relating to delegates to Article V convention. Effective date.
Title
Article V of U.S. Constitution; specifying procedure relating to delegates to Article V convention. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 26 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 26 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |