OK SB5 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; providing immunity from liability for education employees for use of reasonable force.
Title
Schools; providing immunity from liability for education employees for use of reasonable force.
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 25 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 25 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 10; Ayes: 49 Nays: 38 |
2015-04-06 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-04-06 | House | General Order |
2015-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Cockroft (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |