OK SB432 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Education; creating Oklahoma's Career Promise Act; establishing eligibility and benefits. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Education; creating Oklahoma's Career Promise Act; establishing eligibility and benefits. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: CareerTech Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: CareerTech Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | CCR submitted |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 1 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-05-22 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2013-05-22 | Senate | coauthored by Hickman |
2013-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-30 | Senate | coauthored by Cannaday |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 15; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 |
2013-04-25 | House | General Order |
2013-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |