OK SB38 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crime and punishment; modifying parole requirements for medical release from DOC. Effective date.
Title
Crime and punishment; modifying parole requirements for medical release from DOC. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Ben Loring [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | General Order |
2015-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Loring |
2015-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Peterson (principal House author) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shaw |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |