OK SB355 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - SCs named Anderson, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), Holt, Ivester, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-19 - SCs named Anderson, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), Holt, Ivester, Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Letters of guardianship; placing time limitation on validity of certain letters. Effective date.
Title
Letters of guardianship; placing time limitation on validity of certain letters. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Anderson, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), Holt, Ivester, Sparks |
2014-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-15 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-07 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SCs named Anderson, Sykes, Holt, Ivester, Sparks, Johnson (Rob) |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-03 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-02 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-28 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Ivester |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 123 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 4 | 307 | New Code | See Bill Text |