OK SB275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Elections; modifying dates of candidate filing period and providing procedures. Effective date.
Title
Elections; modifying dates of candidate filing period and providing procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 23 Nays: 22 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 80 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 5 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |