OK SB257 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; Oklahoma School Security Institute. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Schools; Oklahoma School Security Institute. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Tahrohon Shannon [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. John Ford [R] |
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Scott Inman [D] |
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 8 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 8 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | coauthored by Nollan |
2013-04-11 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2013-04-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin, Inman, Dorman |
2013-04-11 | House | General Order |
2013-04-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2013-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Emergency added |
2013-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Ford, Burrage |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |