OK SB2122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor 04/02/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency
Title
Multiple versions of statutes; amending, merging and repealing multiple versions of statutes. Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/02/2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-03-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-26 | House | General Order |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2014-03-17 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
26 | 7 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 1116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 199 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 309D | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 523 | New Code | See Bill Text |