OK SB2120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public Employee Retirement System; relating to eligibility for persons licensed by Department of Rehabilitation Services to participate in retirement system. Effective date.
Title
Public Employee Retirement System; relating to eligibility for persons licensed by Department of Rehabilitation Services to participate in retirement system. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-14 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Brinkley, Mazzei, David, Brooks, Ballenger, Ivester |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Bingman |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Mazzei |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brinkley |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1316 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 913 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 935 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |