OK SB21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - coauthored by Coody (Jeff)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - coauthored by Coody (Jeff)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Anti-discrimination Act.
Title
Schools; creating the Religious Viewpoints Anti-discrimination Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] | Rep. Scooter Park [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Coody (Jeff) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-02-23 | Senate | coauthored by Park |
2015-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Fisher, Kern, Russ, Ritze |
2015-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 27 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 27 | 208 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |