OK SB2044 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-9)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; authorizing the borrowing of money for construction of improvements and repairs to the Capitol Building. Effective date
Title
Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; authorizing the borrowing of money for construction of improvements and repairs to the Capitol Building. Effective date
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Sen. Susan Paddack [D] |
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] |
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Roger Ballenger [D] |
Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] |
Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Larry Boggs [R] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] |
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Motion expired |
2014-04-22 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McNiel |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 62 |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Ford, Loveless, Sharp, Schulz, Simpson, Brooks, Griffin, David, Justice, Marlatt, Johnson (Rob), Boggs, Coates, Fields, Halligan, Burrage, Ivester, Barrington, Jolley, Crain, Standridge, Newberry, Shaw |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-02-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Ellis, Ballenger, McAffrey |
2014-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance), Sparks, Paddack, Shumate |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by McNiel (principal House author) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Treat |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |