OK SB1994 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; prohibiting state or political subdivision from establishing health care exchange. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; prohibiting state or political subdivision from establishing health care exchange. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 8 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2014-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) Bennett |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |