OK SB1993 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Child support; modifying procedures for establishing support; modifying requirements for certain notice. Effective date.
Title
Child support; modifying procedures for establishing support; modifying requirements for certain notice. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2014 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 238 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 238 | 6B | New Code | See Bill Text |