OK SB1988 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Courts; relating to Judicial Nominating Commission; modifying appointing authority; vacancies; terms. Effective date.
Title
Courts; relating to Judicial Nominating Commission; modifying appointing authority; vacancies; terms. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by Shortey |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |