OK SB1899 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cemeteries; authorizing municipalities to permit burial places in certain locations. Effective date.
Title
Cemeteries; authorizing municipalities to permit burial places in certain locations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-02-17 | Senate | coauthored by Hulbert (principal House author) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |