OK SB1887 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Environment and natural resources; relating to Conservation Districts; modifying the makeup of district boards. Effective date.
Title
Environment and natural resources; relating to Conservation Districts; modifying the makeup of district boards. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-31 - House - House: Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-05-12 | Senate | SCs named Justice, Fields, Barrington, Marlatt, Garrison, Ballenger |
2014-05-07 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wright |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-04-01 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-01 | House | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Utility and Environmental Regulation Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Utility and Environmental Regulation |
2014-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Emergency removed |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Armes (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27A | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 3 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |