OK SB1875 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Expungement of records; modifying requirements for sealing of certain records. Effective date.
Title
Expungement of records; modifying requirements for sealing of certain records. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2014 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12 |
2014-04-23 | House | Considered |
2014-04-23 | House | Laid over |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |