OK SB1873 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; modifying requirements permitting procurement of insurance through surplus lines brokers. Emergency.
Title
Insurance; modifying requirements permitting procurement of insurance through surplus lines brokers. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCs named Sparks, Brown, Stanislawski, Loveless, Boggs, Paddack |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-07 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-03 | House | General Order |
2014-03-31 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-31 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Blackwell (principal House author) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Insurance |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |