OK SB1870 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-16 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; making certain entities coemployers; making Professional Employer Organization a third-party administrator for failure to register; reporting; modifying unemployment compensation contributions. Effective date.
Title
Labor; making certain entities coemployers; making Professional Employer Organization a third-party administrator for failure to register; reporting; modifying unemployment compensation contributions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 3 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2014-04-07 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative ODonnell |
2014-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sparks |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 209 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 3 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 600 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |