OK SB1848 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health; directing Board of Health to establish certain standards; requiring medical screenings prior to abortion; penalties. Effective date.
Title
Public health; directing Board of Health to establish certain standards; requiring medical screenings prior to abortion; penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Sen. Jim Reynolds [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Rep. David Derby [R] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] | Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 8 |
2014-05-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Walker |
2014-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 9 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2014-05-21 | Senate | coauthored by Echols |
2014-05-16 | Senate | coauthored by Derby, Johnson, Cockroft |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2014-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2014-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-28 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2014-04-24 | House | Considered |
2014-04-24 | House | Laid over |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on Third Reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-24 | House | Amended |
2014-04-24 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-04-24 | House | Amended |
2014-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Griffin |
2014-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern, Reynolds, Turner, Roberts (Sean), Fisher |
2014-04-24 | House | General Order |
2014-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Allen |
2014-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2014-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Christian |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Grau (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 735 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |