OK SB1799 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corporations; relating to shareholder's derivative action; expenses. Effective date.
Title
Corporations; relating to shareholder's derivative action; expenses. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/23/2014 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 25 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |