OK SB1791 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Office of Juvenile Affairs; prohibiting certain fees; permitting Office to access certain records. Effective date.
Title
Office of Juvenile Affairs; prohibiting certain fees; permitting Office to access certain records. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Human Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-04-14 | House | General Order |
2014-04-02 | House | Title restored |
2014-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Nelson (principal House author) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |