OK SB1790 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sports-related injuries; requiring personnel to undergo training; prohibiting athletes returning to competition under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Sports-related injuries; requiring personnel to undergo training; prohibiting athletes returning to competition under certain circumstances. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Motion expired |
2014-04-15 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jackson |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 46 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2014-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Jackson (principal House author) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Emergency added |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |