OK SB1789 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Optometry; permitting optometrists to issue prescriptions for hydrocodone for certain purposes. Effective date.
Title
Optometry; permitting optometrists to issue prescriptions for hydrocodone for certain purposes. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] |
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman |
2014-04-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Rule suspended |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Osborn (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |