OK SB1746 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Lobbying; modifying definitions and various provisions. Effective date.
Title
Lobbying; modifying definitions and various provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Request for conference rescinded; returned to House Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 30 |
2014-04-22 | House | General Order |
2014-03-27 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ivester |
2014-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Russ (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |