OK SB1723 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Income tax; modifying deduction for members of Armed Forces; deleting contingency relating to deduction. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; modifying deduction for members of Armed Forces; deleting contingency relating to deduction. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue, Taxation, and Employee Compensation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue, Taxation, and Employee Compensation Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Wright |
2014-04-15 | House | General Order |
2014-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-02-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Banz (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |