OK SB1612 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Enforcement of visitation rights; modifying procedures relating to enforcement of visitation rights. Effective date.
Title
Enforcement of visitation rights; modifying procedures relating to enforcement of visitation rights. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] | Rep. Mark McBride [R] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-13 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCs named Sharp, Sykes, Holt, Burrage, Boggs, Shumate |
2014-04-28 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2014-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | Remove as coauthor Senator(s) Johnson (Constance) |
2014-03-26 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |