OK SB1591 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 15
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; restricting the location of commercial pet breeders near schools or day care facilities. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; restricting the location of commercial pet breeders near schools or day care facilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 15 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-24 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-03-27 | House | Title restored |
2014-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Denney (principal House author) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Loveless |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |