OK SB1537 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-10 - Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Epinephrine injections; permitting certain facilities to stock and administer epinephrine injections in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Epinephrine injections; permitting certain facilities to stock and administer epinephrine injections in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Health and Human Services |
2014-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Johnson (Constance) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 291 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 292 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb1537&Session=1400 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2013-14bills/SB/sb1537_int.rtf |