OK SB1495 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; creating the Oklahoma Medicaid Reform Act of 2014. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; creating the Oklahoma Medicaid Reform Act of 2014. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Suspend Rule (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-17 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 21 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator David |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1011 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1011 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |