OK SB1341 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Income tax; limiting time period during which certain tax credits are allowed; limiting amount allowed per taxpayer for certain time period. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; limiting time period during which certain tax credits are allowed; limiting amount allowed per taxpayer for certain time period. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 4 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |