OK SB1338 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Progressing Rural Economic Prosperity Fund; establishing revolving funds for Department of Commerce, Space Industry Development Authority, and Department of Aerospace and Aeronautics. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Progressing Rural Economic Prosperity Fund; establishing revolving funds for Department of Commerce, Space Industry Development Authority, and Department of Aerospace and Aeronautics. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-04 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |