OK SB1332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Driver licenses; authorizing a test to be taken on the Internet; providing for a certain downgrade and reinstatement of CDL licenses; providing a certain fee waiver. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Driver licenses; authorizing a test to be taken on the Internet; providing for a certain downgrade and reinstatement of CDL licenses; providing a certain fee waiver. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Marlatt |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | HAs read |
2014-04-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ |
2014-04-03 | House | General Order |
2014-03-26 | House | Title restored |
2014-03-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2014-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Justice, Allen |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Schulz |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 6 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |