OK SB1181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the Oklahoma-A STEM State of Mind Program; creating an advisory committee. Effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Oklahoma-A STEM State of Mind Program; creating an advisory committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2014 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 16; Ayes: 34 Nays: 42 |
2014-04-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner |
2014-04-23 | House | General Order |
2014-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Loveless |
2014-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | coauthored by Wood (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |