OK SB1148 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Income tax; limiting time period during which tax credits for donations are allowed. Effective date.
Title
Income tax; limiting time period during which tax credits for donations are allowed. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-02-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-02-10 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2014-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mazzei |
2014-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |