OK SB1062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; creating the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; creating the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF CHAIR (Y: 59 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: APPEAL RULING OF CHAIR (Y: 59 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Table (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Griffin |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2013-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Walker, Russ |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 24 |
2013-04-24 | House | Title restored |
2013-04-24 | House | Amended |
2013-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Mazzei |
2013-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Sanders, Biggs, Echols, Jackson, McCullough, Murphey, Ownbey, Newell, Denney, Derby, Wright, Martin (Steve), Cockroft, Schwartz, Cox, Osborn, Roberts (Dustin), Stiles, Mulready |
2013-04-24 | House | General Order |
2013-04-10 | House | Title stricken |
2013-04-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Turner, Hulbert |
2013-04-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote tabled |
2013-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Schulz |
2013-02-28 | Senate | coauthored by Brecheen, Standridge, Marlatt |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Sykes |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-27 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry, David, Jolley, Ford, Crain, Allen, Brinkley |
2013-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by McBride, Cooksey |
2013-02-26 | Senate | coauthored by Justice, Treat, Simpson, Loveless, Boggs, Branan, Brown |
2013-02-25 | Senate | coauthored by Fields, Brooks |
2013-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2013-02-19 | Senate | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | coauthored by Sykes |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bingman |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |