OK SB1062 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Workers' compensation; creating the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; creating the Administrative Workers' Compensation Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-30 - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House: ADVANCE FROM GENERAL ORDER (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 63 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House: APPEAL RULING OF CHAIR (Y: 59 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate: Table (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-06SenateApproved by Governor 05/06/2013
2013-05-02SenatePending coauthorship Senator(s) Griffin
2013-04-30SenateSent to Governor
2013-04-30HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2013-04-30SenateEnrolled, to House
2013-04-30SenateReferred for enrollment
2013-04-30SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
2013-04-30SenateHAs adopted
2013-04-29Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2013-04-29Senatecoauthored by Walker, Russ
2013-04-29SenateHAs read
2013-04-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-04-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 24
2013-04-24HouseTitle restored
2013-04-24HouseAmended
2013-04-24HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Mazzei
2013-04-24HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Sanders, Biggs, Echols, Jackson, McCullough, Murphey, Ownbey, Newell, Denney, Derby, Wright, Martin (Steve), Cockroft, Schwartz, Cox, Osborn, Roberts (Dustin), Stiles, Mulready
2013-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2013-04-10HouseTitle stricken
2013-04-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Turner, Hulbert
2013-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2013-03-14HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2013-03-05HouseFirst Reading
2013-03-05SenateEngrossed to House
2013-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2013-03-04SenateMotion to reconsider vote tabled
2013-03-04Senatecoauthored by Schulz
2013-02-28Senatecoauthored by Brecheen, Standridge, Marlatt
2013-02-27SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Sykes
2013-02-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 12
2013-02-27SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2013-02-27Senatecoauthored by Newberry, David, Jolley, Ford, Crain, Allen, Brinkley
2013-02-26Senatecoauthored by McBride, Cooksey
2013-02-26Senatecoauthored by Justice, Treat, Simpson, Loveless, Boggs, Branan, Brown
2013-02-25Senatecoauthored by Fields, Brooks
2013-02-19Senatecoauthored by Holt
2013-02-19Senatecoauthored by Shannon (principal House author)
2013-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
2013-02-18Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2013-02-18Senatecoauthored by Sykes
2013-02-13SenateReferred to Judiciary
2013-02-13SenateWithdrawn from Rules committee
2013-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2013-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bingman
2013-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7418m1Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback