OK HR1038 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-29)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-29)
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Rose Day; recognizing February 5, 2014, as Rose Day.
Title
Rose Day; recognizing February 5, 2014, as Rose Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2014-02-05 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2014-02-05 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2014-02-05 | House | Considered |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Reynolds |
2014-02-03 | House | Introduced |