OK HR1017 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-29)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 72-29)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Observing May 2, 2013, as the National Day of Prayer in the State of Oklahoma.
Title
Observing May 2, 2013, as the National Day of Prayer in the State of Oklahoma.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2013-05-02 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2013-05-02 | House | Coauthored by all other Representatives |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered |
2013-04-10 | House | Authored by Representative Denney |
2013-04-10 | House | Introduced |