OK HJR1099 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of Oklahoma state agencies; distribution.
Title
Approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of Oklahoma state agencies; distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DIVISION (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 31 |
2014-05-21 | House | Amended |
2014-05-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2014-05-21 | House | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-21 | House | General Order |
2014-05-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-05-05 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2014-05-05 | House | First Reading |