OK HJR1096 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Salaries and compensation; amending certain salaries; providing certain salaries not increase; effective date; emergency.
Title
Salaries and compensation; amending certain salaries; providing certain salaries not increase; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider emergency tabled |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 34; Ayes: 69 Nays: 9 |
2014-05-21 | House | Ayes: 45 Nays: 28 |
2014-05-21 | House | JCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | House | General Order |
2014-05-20 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-20 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-04-08 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-04-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-04-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 215 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 250 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |