OK HJR1026 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-28 - Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; clarifying manner in which citizens may keep and bear arms; ballot title; filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; clarifying manner in which citizens may keep and bear arms; ballot title; filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - House: States' Rights Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2013-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2013-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States' Rights Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to States' Rights
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Fisher, Kern
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback