OK HJR1003 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; legislative sessions; budgets; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; legislative sessions; budgets; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Randon Grau [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2014-03-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 18 |
2014-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2014-03-13 | House | Amended |
2014-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell, Quinn, Casey |
2014-03-13 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Grau |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |