OK HB3542 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Statutes and reports; transferring certain duties to the Secretary of State.
Title
Statutes and reports; transferring certain duties to the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 1 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 22; Ayes: 59 Nays: 24 |
2014-05-20 | House | JCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | General Order |
2014-05-19 | House | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-16 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Justice |
2014-05-15 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-15 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott), Sears |
2014-05-15 | House | First Reading |