OK HB3517 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Health Care Authority; providing for duties and compensation of employees; budget limitations and procedures.
Title
Health Care Authority; providing for duties and compensation of employees; budget limitations and procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-22 | House | Motion expired |
2014-05-20 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Proctor |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3; Ayes: 57 Nays: 22 |
2014-05-20 | House | JCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | House | General Order |
2014-05-19 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2014-05-13 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Justice |
2014-05-13 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-13 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott), Sears |
2014-05-13 | House | First Reading |