OK HB3509 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; directing the Oklahoma Tax Commission to issue a separate exemption card to certain persons authorized to make purchases on behalf of an eligible veteran; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; directing the Oklahoma Tax Commission to issue a separate exemption card to certain persons authorized to make purchases on behalf of an eligible veteran; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-05-23 | Senate | coauthored by Standridge |
2014-05-19 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Hickman and substitute with Representative Martin (Scott) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2014-05-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-05-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Bennett |
2014-05-15 | House | General Order |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) |
2014-05-12 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2014-05-12 | House | First Reading |