OK HB3457 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-04-29 - Vetoed 04/29/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Counties; modifying powers of county commissioners; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; modifying powers of county commissioners; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-29HouseVetoed 04/29/2014
2014-04-23HouseSent to Governor
2014-04-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2014-04-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2014-04-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2014-04-22SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2014-04-22Senatecoauthored by Johnson (Constance)
2014-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2014-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-03-24SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2014-03-13SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2014-03-06Senatecoauthored by Shelton
2014-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2014-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2014-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Shumate (principal Senate author)
2014-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Pittman
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback